TN HB2350 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of knowingly or recklessly permitting a child under 12 years of age to have access to or possession, custody, or use of a firearm unless the person has the permission of the child's parent or guardian, the child is under the supervision of an adult, and the firearm was used for lawful sporting activity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2024-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Reset on Final cal. #2 of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2287 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee