TN HB2368 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 750
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 750
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits electronic citations for certain traffic offenses; establishes a $5.00 electronic citation fee for each citation resulting in conviction. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, permits electronic citations for certain traffic offenses; establishes a $5.00 electronic citation fee for each citation resulting in conviction. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Watson [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 750 |
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 7501 |
2014-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Re-ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee--Civil Justice |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2350 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 750