TN HB2389 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the retail sale of marijuana; levies a 12 percent tax on the retail sale of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the retail sale of marijuana; levies a 12 percent tax on the retail sale of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1849 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020