TN HB2392 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds state university boards of trustees to the list of governing boards authorized to promulgate rules to effectuate the requirement that persons required to register for the federal draft must be registered for the draft in order to be eligible for enrollment in a state postsecondary school. - Amends TCA Section 49-7-114.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-7-114, relative to draft registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-01 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2525 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.