TN HB2541 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes mayors of certain local governments to enter into voluntary agreements for energy infrastructure improvements for clean or renewable energy; requires that agreements be approved either by resolution of the respective legislative bodies of such local governments or in accordance with statutory requirements. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13, Chapter 3; Title 13, Chapter 4 and Title 13, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13, Chapter 3; Title 13, Chapter 4 and Title 13, Chapter 7, relative to energy infrastructure improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2424 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.