TN HB2550 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that on or before January 31 of each year the department shall report information regarding child support to the general assembly and the governor. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 41; Title 49; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 41; Title 49; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2354 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee