TN HB2565 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the amount of time both parents or a guardian have to make a written application for a hearing challenging a local school board's order placing a student in a certain public school from within 10 days after an assignment order to within 15 days after an assignment order. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2592 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee