TN HB2598 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to maintain staffing levels of case managers not to exceed 20 active cases or 20 children monitored in active cases for six months following the effective date of this act, then reduced to 14 active cases or 14 children monitored in active cases. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2621 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee