TN HB2604 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the lottery corporation and board to comply with certain diversity in contracting requirements when contracting with third parties to enforce the Tennessee Sports Gaming Act and supervise compliance with laws and rules relating to the regulation and control of wagering on sporting events in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 14.
Title
As introduced, requires the lottery corporation and board to comply with certain diversity in contracting requirements when contracting with third parties to enforce the Tennessee Sports Gaming Act and supervise compliance with laws and rules relating to the regulation and control of wagering on sporting events in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2819 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee