TN HB2611 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the attorney general and reporter to investigate human trafficking offenses, organized crime offenses, and related criminal activity; authorizes the attorney general and reporter to prosecute such offenses either with consent of the district attorney general or after appointment as district attorney general pro tempore by the supreme court; requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation to provide assistance to the attorney general and reporter as needed. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 38, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 38, Chapter 6, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1802 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Transmitted to Governor for action.