TN HB2628 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a county from prohibiting an individual householder from disposing of solid waste from such householder's own household upon such householder's own land as long as the disposal does not create a public nuisance or a hazard to the public health. - Amends TCA Title 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, relative to the authority of county governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-02-21 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2137 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee