TN HB2692 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the court to order an offender to wear a global positioning monitoring system device under certain circumstances unless the court finds the offender no longer poses a threat to the alleged victim or public safety; specifies that a cellular device application or electronic receptor device provided to the victim must be capable of notifying the victim if the offender is within a prescribed proximity of the victim's cellular device or electronic receptor device; requires a county or municipality utilizing global positioning monitoring system devices to enter into a written agreement with a qualified contract service provider; removes civil and criminal liability under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 55, Chapter 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 55, Chapter 10, relative to pretrial release.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1972 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.