TN HB2700 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each member of a board of directors of an industrial development corporation to complete a conflict-of-interest statement; requires the Tennessee Ethics Commission to post on its website a sample conflict of interest statement. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53.
Title
As introduced, requires each member of a board of directors of an industrial development corporation to complete a conflict-of-interest statement; requires the Tennessee Ethics Commission to post on its website a sample conflict of interest statement. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2528 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020