TN HB2708 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Pregnant Workers Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Pregnant Workers Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 745 | |
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Government Operations |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2520 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 745