TN HB2723 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Pr. Ch. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Pr. Ch. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes property owners that do not live in the city to vote in city elections; removes disability for six months as a reason for the vacancy of the office of mayor or councilman; permanently prohibits persons convicted of certain crimes from holding office; creates process for electing a council member if the council is unable to appoint one in the event of a vacancy; authorizes the city to donate or contribute funds in accordance with state law; renames the city clerk and recorder the city recorder; changes provisions related to purchasing and the sale of city property; makes other revisions to the charter. - Amends Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2004; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes property owners that do not live in the city to vote in city elections; removes disability for six months as a reason for the vacancy of the office of mayor or councilman; permanently prohibits persons convicted of certain crimes from holding office; creates process for electing a council member if the council is unable to appoint one in the event of a vacancy; authorizes the city to donate or contribute funds in accordance with state law; renames the city clerk and recorder the city recorder; changes provisions related to purchasing and the sale of city property; makes other revisions to the charter. - Amends Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2004; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Pr. Ch. 58 | |
2018-05-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2126 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 779
SB2755 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 58
SB2755 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 58