TN HB2773 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a minor's parent or legal guardian have access to the minor's prescription records even when the minor is able to obtain treatment without parental consent. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 66 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 66 and Title 68, relative to parental access to a minor child's medical information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0820) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 3, PNV 4 |
2024-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0707) |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2482 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.