TN HB2795 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Restoring State Sovereignty Through Nullification Act," which establishes processes by which the general assembly may nullify an unconstitutional federal statute, regulation, agency order, or executive order. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3 and Title 4, relative to nullification.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2775 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Deferred to Summer Study