TN HB2857 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes from the definition of "provider-based telemedicine" the requirement that the healthcare service provider or the provider's practice group or healthcare system have an established provider-patient relationship that is documented by an in-person encounter within 16 months prior to the interactive visit. - Amends TCA Section 56-7-1003.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 56-7-1003, relative to telemedicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1881 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures