TN HB2859 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the operation of a golf cart on gravel roads within the campgrounds of state parks in addition to paved roads if such gravel roads are marked suitable for a golf cart. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 11; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 11; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to parks.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2827 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Transmitted to Governor for action.