TN HB2925 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes an obsolete provision requiring the public utility commission to report by 2011 to the speaker of the senate, the speaker of the house of representatives, the governor, the chair of the commerce and labor committee of the senate, and the chair of the commerce committee of the house of representatives regarding state-issued certificates of franchise authority under the Competitive Cable and Video Services Act. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68, relative to government approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2834 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.