TN HJR0709 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed for lack of motion in: Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed for lack of motion in: Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges state government and departments and agencies thereof to consult a multi-faith calendar prior to scheduling official functions.
Title
A RESOLUTION to urge the State of Tennessee and the departments and agencies thereof to consult a multi-faith calendar prior to scheduling official functions.
Sponsors
Rep. Aftyn Behn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |