TN HJR0955 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Eureka Lodge #3 in Memphis, 150th anniversary
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize Eureka Lodge #3 in Memphis on the occasion of its 150th anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Torrey Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-22 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |