TN HJR0963 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-21)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-21)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennesseans for opposing and condemning neo-Nazism
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring and commending Tennesseans for their opposition to and condemnation of neo-Nazism and the National Socialist Movement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: UNFINISHED BUSINESS MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: UNFINISHED BUSINESS MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-22 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | R/S Intro |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |