TN HJR1142 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-23)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-23)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
First anniversary of the Covenant School shooting
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the victims, their families, and the first responders on the occasion of the one-year anniversary of the Covenant School shooting in Nashville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: WELCOMING AND HONORING MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: WELCOMING AND HONORING MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-28 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2024-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Filed for introduction |