TN SB0010 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Trans. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Trans. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that all written examinations for a driver license or intermediate driver license be in English. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires that all written examinations for a driver license or intermediate driver license be in English. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Deferred to:2/9/2011 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Deferred to:2/9/2011 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Deferred to:2/9/2011 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of Trans. Com. | |
2012-01-12 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 1/18/2012 | |
2011-04-13 | Action def. in S. Trans. Comm. to 1st cal of 2012 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-02 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 2/9/2011 | |
2011-01-15 | Ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2011-01-12 | P2C, Held on desk pending committee appointments | |
2011-01-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-12-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0454 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-05 - Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to First calendar 2012