TN SB0057 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides that each county with a population in excess of 100,000 according to 2010 federal census be served by at least three divisions of general sessions court to be presided over by at least three full-time judges. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 15.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides that each county with a population in excess of 100,000 according to 2010 federal census be served by at least three divisions of general sessions court to be presided over by at least three full-time judges. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 15.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-28 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0667 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback