TN SB0077 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Property Owners Bill of Rights." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 29; Title 43; Title 64; Title 65; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Property Owners Bill of Rights." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 29; Title 43; Title 64; Title 65; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Withdrawn. | |
2010-03-24 | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-29 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0502 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0077&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0077.pdf |