TN SB0077 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of commerce and insurance to set by rule the amount of the annual manufacturer, retailer, and installer license fees; makes other various changes to the regulation of manufactured homes. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 126, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 126, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of commerce and insurance to set by rule the amount of the annual manufacturer, retailer, and installer license fees; makes other various changes to the regulation of manufactured homes. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 126, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 126, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 483 | |
2015-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2015; 01/01/2016 | |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2015-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0397) |
2015-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0258) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0067 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483