TN SB0111 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates social media platforms as common carriers and requires the entities to obtain certificates of public convenience and necessity from the Tennessee public utilities commission; prescribes fines against social media platforms that deplatform and shadow ban users based on political ideology, viewpoint, or personal animus, or discrimination based on race, creed, color, religion, sex, age, or national origin. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 47 and Title 65, relative to social media.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0682 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.