TN SB0163 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires commissioner to report the death of any person in custody to members of the general assembly representing the legislative districts where the deceased person resided at the time of death within five, rather than 10, business days of death; adds requirement that the report identify the facility where the death occurred, subject to confidentiality requirements. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires commissioner to report the death of any person in custody to members of the general assembly representing the legislative districts where the deceased person resided at the time of death within five, rather than 10, business days of death; adds requirement that the report identify the facility where the death occurred, subject to confidentiality requirements. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0726 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback