TN SB0175 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a dental service plan corporation to show ability to pay the greater of operating expenses for six months or $10,000, instead of $2,500, in order to apply for and obtain a license to operate a dental service plan. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires a dental service plan corporation to show ability to pay the greater of operating expenses for six months or $10,000, instead of $2,500, in order to apply for and obtain a license to operate a dental service plan. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0454 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee