TN SB0186 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds an adopted child, stepchild, and relative related by marriage to the list of persons with whom a service member can jointly title and register a motor vehicle in order to qualify for a sales and use tax exemption on the sale or use of the motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-303.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-6-303, relative to tax exemption for service members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee