TN SB0242 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, repeals the Hamblen County special endowment fund. - Chapter 106 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, repeals the Hamblen County special endowment fund. - Chapter 106 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 7 | |
2011-03-31 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0503 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 7