TN SB0246 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits sale of baby food and infant formula in containers containing bisphenol A and sale of all food and beverages in reusable containers containing bisphenol A beginning January 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 53 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits sale of baby food and infant formula in containers containing bisphenol A and sale of all food and beverages in reusable containers containing bisphenol A beginning January 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 53 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-27 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0190 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback