TN SB0246 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the presumption of a student's intent to violate the School Security Act of 1981 by possessing an electronic pager on school property. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the presumption of a student's intent to violate the School Security Act of 1981 by possessing an electronic pager on school property. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0118 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-03 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback