TN SB0249 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 258
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 258
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the ability for a producer of motor vehicles to enter into certain lease transactions for certain vehicles to the producer's employees; increases from three to four the number of vehicles that a producer may lease to full-time employees and specifically authorizes producers to lease up to four vehicles to leased employees of producers who work on site at a producer's facility in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 55-17-123.
Title
As enacted, removes the ability for a producer of motor vehicles to enter into certain lease transactions for certain vehicles to the producer's employees; increases from three to four the number of vehicles that a producer may lease to full-time employees and specifically authorizes producers to lease up to four vehicles to leased employees of producers who work on site at a producer's facility in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 55-17-123.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Pub. Ch. 258 |
2013-04-30 | House | Effective date(s) 04/23/2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0282) |
2013-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0219) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0863 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 258