TN SB0256 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decriminalizes the possession of less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, decriminalizes the possession of less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0235 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.