TN SB0267 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises law relative to the total number of beds in private for-profit and private not-for-profit intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities (ICF/1ID). - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 1, relative to intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 254 | |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0322) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0322) |
2023-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0133) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0012) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/8/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 2-8-23 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0315 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254