TN SB0268 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for erection of directional signs for Children's Holocaust Memorial at Whitwell Middle School on Interstate 24 in Marion County.
Title
As enacted, provides for erection of directional signs for Children's Holocaust Memorial at Whitwell Middle School on Interstate 24 in Marion County.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Pub. Ch. 146 | |
2011-05-10 | Effective date(s) 05/05/11 | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-27 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-25 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-25 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-03-21 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-17 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/17/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/2/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-01 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0341 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 146