TN SB0293 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires charter schools authorized by the achievement school district (ASD) to conduct an initial student application period of at least 30 days; specifies that if the ASD authorizes a charter school, the ASD will receive an annual authorizer fee of up to three percent of the charter school's per student state and local funding. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires charter schools authorized by the achievement school district (ASD) to conduct an initial student application period of at least 30 days; specifies that if the ASD authorizes a charter school, the ASD will receive an annual authorizer fee of up to three percent of the charter school's per student state and local funding. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 507 | |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/7/2016 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. Cal. 3/31/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0473 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 507