TN SB0378 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 07/01/2023, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 07/01/2023, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, regulates the production and sale of hemp-derived cannabinoids, including products known as delta-8 and delta-10. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43, Chapter 27; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43, Chapter 27; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 7, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 07/01/2023, 07/01/2024 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 423 | |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2023-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0451) |
2023-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0366) |
2023-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 2 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0458) |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0467) |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0194) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0403 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423