TN SB0398 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the state oil and gas board reclamation fund in light of change in board's name in 2012 to Tennessee board of water quality, oil and gas. - Amends TCA Title 60.
Title
As enacted, renames the state oil and gas board reclamation fund in light of change in board's name in 2012 to Tennessee board of water quality, oil and gas. - Amends TCA Title 60.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0337 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-16 - Pub. Ch. 94