TN SB0414 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "SEM Advancement Act," which requires a local board of education or charter school governing body to develop and adopt a policy that establishes criteria for the enrollment of students in grades seven through 12 into available advanced English language arts, mathematics, and science courses. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10, relative to advanced coursework.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 170 | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0027) |
2021-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0098) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0973 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 170