TN SB0415 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 30 to 60, the amount of days within which an individual may request a hearing pursuant to the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act following the denial of an individual's application for an employee permit provided by the alcoholic beverage commission, when the individual fails to meet certain requirements but is otherwise eligible for a permit. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0378 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.