TN SB0503 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redesignates that public automobile auction, and not public automobile auctioneer, shall take possession and retain title of each motor vehicle offered for sale at auction. - Amends TCA Section 55-17-114 and Title 62, Chapter 19, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, redesignates that public automobile auction, and not public automobile auctioneer, shall take possession and retain title of each motor vehicle offered for sale at auction. - Amends TCA Section 55-17-114 and Title 62, Chapter 19, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0630 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Assigned to s/c Small Business of COM
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0503&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0503.pdf |