TN SB0517 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Effective date(s) 4/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Effective date(s) 4/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Representative Darren Jernigan Act," which requires, beginning on January 1, 2025, and each year thereafter, the department of revenue to verify that the owner of each disabled parking placard has not died; requires the department to promptly invalidate a disabled parking placard if the recipient of the placard is found to be deceased. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, relative to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Effective date(s) 4/19/2024 | |
2024-04-29 | Pub. Ch. 726 | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0781) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0781) |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0659) |
2024-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0610) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0465 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726