TN SB0638 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the expenses for which a crime victim or claimant meeting eligibility requirements may receive reimbursement from the criminal injuries compensation fund. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 29, Chapter 13; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 29, Chapter 13; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to crime victim compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0166 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0638&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB0638.pdf |