TN SB0678 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that subsidies paid by the state to a county for housing state inmates be paid from the date of conviction; requires a clerk of the court to transmit documentation of a conviction to the department of correction not later than five business days after the date of conviction. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 8; Title 9; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires that subsidies paid by the state to a county for housing state inmates be paid from the date of conviction; requires a clerk of the court to transmit documentation of a conviction to the department of correction not later than five business days after the date of conviction. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 8; Title 9; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0182 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee