TN SB0804 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the board of examiners in psychology to designate as a health service provider in this state a person who has held a license to practice psychology in another state under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 11, relative to psychology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0904 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee