TN SB0821 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes any county, including any county having a metropolitan form of government, or incorporated city or town, to acquire a school building owned by a county school system or city school system within its borders that is blighted or deteriorated; allows the local government to use any school building acquired by eminent domain to establish offices for the provision of community services. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, authorizes any county, including any county having a metropolitan form of government, or incorporated city or town, to acquire a school building owned by a county school system or city school system within its borders that is blighted or deteriorated; allows the local government to use any school building acquired by eminent domain to establish offices for the provision of community services. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0555 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.